This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/11/2018 at 16:56:48 (UTC).

FOX VS HILLMAN

Case Summary

On 03/30/2011 FOX filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILLMAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0759

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC

Defendant

RONNIE HILLMAN

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RONNIE HILLMAN. (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RONNIE HILLMAN. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED. (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RONNIE HILLMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 04/04/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RONNIE HILLMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 04/04/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

VENUE CHALLENGE LETTER OF RONNIE HILLMAN PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

VENUE CHALLENGE LETTER OF RONNIE HILLMAN PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110330-0621 $100.00; 110330-0621-CK Reference Number 1786

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL DORN, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC REPRESENTED BY DAVID LANGREHR.; DEFENDANT RONNIE HILLMAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; 02:23; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; RONNIE HILLMAN'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 03/30/2011 OF FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: INCORRECT VENUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; 02:03; JAMES MICHAEL DORN, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: SARAH GARCIA; BAILIFF: R. CROONQUIST; APPEARANCES:; FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC REPRESENTED BY DAVID LANGREHR.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: ONLY EXTENSION; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/26/11 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT F2R.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NEW COURT DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY RONNIE HILLMAN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RONNIE HILLMAN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RONNIE HILLMAN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RONNIE HILLMAN FOR MOTION TO VACATE IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/26/11

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FOX TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF VENUE CHALLENGE REMAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RONNIE HILLMAN. PARTY SERVED ON 04/04/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • VENUE CHALLENGE LETTER PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • VENUE CHALLENGE LETTER OF RONNIE HILLMAN PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110330-0621 $100.00; 110330-0621-CK Reference Number 1786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less