This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:21:14 (UTC).

FOUDA -V- JOHNS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 FOUDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0998

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALAK FOUDA

Defendant

LATONYA JOHNS

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - DENIED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - DENIED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. INCOME EXCEEDS LIMIT/COURT NEEDS MORE INFO; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. INCOME EXCEEDS LIMIT/COURT NEEDS MORE INFO; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SHANNON SUBER PRO TEM; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MALAK FOUDA PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:20; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- MALAK FOUDA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT PARTIALLY GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR SPECIFIC FEES THAT ARE WAIVED.; APPLICANT SHALL PAY ALL FEES THAT ARE NOT WAIVED WITHIN 10 DAYS OF RECEIVING NOTICE.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; 11:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LATONYA JOHNS. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LATONYA JOHNS. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: MELINDA MORALES; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MALAK FOUDA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LATONYA JOHNS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; LATONYA JOHNS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MALAK FOUDA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LATONYA JOHNS.; JUDGMENT FOR: MALAK FOUDA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LATONYA JOHNS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,828.62 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $50.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,878.62; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: MELINDA MORALES; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MALAK FOUDA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LATONYA JOHNS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; LATONYA JOHNS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MALAK FOUDA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LATONYA JOHNS.; JUDGMENT FOR: MALAK FOUDA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LATONYA JOHNS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,828.62 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $50.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,878.62; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT FWF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR 1ST PAPER PAID BY MALAK FOUDA IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 170112-0441 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • FEES ON FEE WAIVER ORDER OF 01/10/17 FOR DOCUMENT COURT FEES PAID IN FULL BY MALAK FOUDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON FEE WAIVER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. INCOME EXCEEDS LIMIT/COURT NEEDS MORE INFO; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SHANNON SUBER PRO TEM; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MALAK FOUDA PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:20; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- MALAK FOUDA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT PARTIALLY GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR SPECIFIC FEES THAT ARE WAIVED.; APPLICANT SHALL PAY ALL FEES THAT ARE NOT WAIVED WITHIN 10 DAYS OF RECEIVING NOTICE.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; 11:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MALAK FOUDA IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • COPY OF SC-100 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LATONYA JOHNS. PARTY SERVED ON 12/19/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER OM FEE WAIVER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • COURT ORDERS A HEARING REGARDING FEE WAIVER FOR MALAK FOUDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MALAK FOUDA IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MALAK FOUDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.