This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 15:05:33 (UTC).

FOSTER-V-CALVO FAMILY HOUSING

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 FOSTER-V-CALVO FAMILY HOUSING was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4634

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAVONNE FOSTER

Defendants

CALVO FAMILY HOUSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

1851 IVAR APARTMENTS LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEDIN,BEGAKIS & BISH

880 W 1St Street Suite 302

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO 1851 IVAR APARTMENTS LLP SERVED ON 07/16/13 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/ADR/CCS/NTC OF CSE ASSIGN FILED AS TO CALVO FAMILY HOUSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. PARTY SERVED ON 06/12/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL-AUTH AGENT. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/ADR/CCS/NTC OF CASE ASSIGN FILED AS TO 1851 IVAR APARTMENTS LLP. PARTY SERVED ON 06/12/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL - AUTH AGENT. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): EACH DEFENDANT NEEDS ITS OWN PROOF OF SERVICE CAN NOT HAVE MULTIPLE DEFS ON LINE 3A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130508-1622 $0.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SHAVONNE FOSTER FOR POSTAGE PAID ENVELOPE; Minutes; Receipt: 130507-3332 $0.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SHAVONNE FOSTER FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 130507-3337 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SHAVONNE FOSTER FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 130507-3324 $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 130507-3264 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CALVO FAMILY HOUSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant