This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:32:41 (UTC).

FORTIER VS NELMS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 FORTIER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NELMS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8327

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMBER JOI FORTIER

Defendant

JEREMIAH NELMS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY AMBER JOI FORTIER

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY AMBER JOI FORTIER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEREMIAH NELMS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEREMIAH NELMS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0603 $75.00; 171030-0603-VS Reference Number 031-0055559167

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AMBER JOI FORTIER PRESENT; DEFENDANT JEREMIAH NELMS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NOT RECORDED; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: AMBER JOI FORTIER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEREMIAH NELMS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $350.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $420.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $80.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/05/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 5TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JEREMIAH NELMS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY AMBER JOI FORTIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PARTY JEREMIAH NELMS UPDATED: CORRECT DEFENDANT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM SMC/FS1708326A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM SMC/FS1708326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM SMCFS1708326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY JEREMIAH NELMS UPDATED: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0603 $75.00; 171030-0603-VS Reference Number 031-0055559167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY JEREMIAH NELMS UPDATED: SPELLING

    Read MoreRead Less