This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 17:39:38 (UTC).

FLORES VS GAMOBA/FELIX/OCHOA

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 FLORES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GAMOBA/FELIX/OCHOA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1550

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE LUIS SANCHEZ FLORES

Defendants

JACKIE OCHOA

ALFREDO FELIX

THOMAS FELIX

ROSA FELIX

GONZALO GAMOBA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170411-0410 $25.00; 170411-0410-CK Reference Number 1169521

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/08/2017 OF JOSE SANCHEZ FLORES ORDERED ENTERED 04/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSE LUIS SANCHEZ FLORES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/10/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/10/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX SERVED ON 03/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $375.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX SERVED ON 03/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $375.00 FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170308-0578 $255.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/08/2017 OF JOSE SANCHEZ FLORES GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSE LUIS SANCHEZ FLORES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $800.00 AND DAMAGES $2,880.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,080.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 05/10/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $800.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • 585/SUB OF ATTORNEY RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SECTION 6B IS MISSING FULL ZIPCODES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/08/2017 OF JOSE SANCHEZ FLORES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/10/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO GONZALO GAMOBA, ROSA FELIX, ALFREDO FELIX, JACKIE OCHOA, THOMAS FELIX SERVED ON 03/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $375.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170308-0578 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.00.--BEGINNING ON 02/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.