This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 02:23:49 (UTC).

FLORES -v- ROCCHETTI, ETAL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2016 FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROCCHETTI, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0468

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELIA FLORES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LEWIS ROCCHETTI

JUAN AYALA ROMAN

ESTEVES LOGISTICS CORP., A CORPORATION

CONVERGEONE, INC.

ESTEVEZ LOGISTICS CORP.

ESTEVEZ LOGISTICS CORP., A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, BROILLET &WHEELER, LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard Sutie 2100

Santa Monica, CA 90407-2131

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THARPE & HOWELL

15250 Ventura Blvd 9Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

CREMIN, PATRICK C

2575 Collier Canyon Rd

Livermore, CA 94551

BORDIN MARTORELL, LLP

6100 Center Dr. Suite 1130

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DELIA FLORES

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DELIA FLORES

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DELIA FLORES

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DELIA FLORES

COURT RULING ON MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL FILED.

COURT RULING ON MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL FILED.

REPLY TO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: TO SEVER TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18 FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: TO SEVER TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18 FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO SERVER TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT CONVERGEONE, INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO SERVER TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT CONVERGEONE, INC. (IMAGED)

COURT RULING ON CONVERGEONE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

COURT RULING ON CONVERGEONE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

REPLY TO MEMO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/18 FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO MEMO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/26/18 FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.. (IMAGED)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.

ANSWER FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BORDIN MARTORELL, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BORDIN MARTORELL, LLP.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF ANSWER OF LEWIS ROCCHETTI SENT.

NOTICE OF ANSWER OF LEWIS ROCCHETTI SENT.; Minutes; WHEN THE COMPLAINT WAS AMENDED TO FIRST THE CROSS DEFENDANT LEWIS ROCCHETTI; WAS NOT LISTED ON THE COMPLAINT. THE PARTY WAS REMOVED.

ANSWER FILED BY LEWIS ROCCHETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF IRENEA. FRAZIER.

ANSWER FILED BY LEWIS ROCCHETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF IRENEA. FRAZIER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUAN ROMAN

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JUAN ROMAN

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY LEWIS ROCCHETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF IRENEA. FRAZIER.

ANSWER FILED BY LEWIS ROCCHETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF IRENEA. FRAZIER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEWIS ROCCHETTI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $68.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEWIS ROCCHETTI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $68.95 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT RULING ON MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO SERVER TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CONVERGEONE, INC.; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MOLLY MCKIBBEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; GARY LOFTIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JUAN AYALA ROMAN, ESTEVES LOGISTICS CORP., A CORPORATION.; ATTORNEY JUSTIN SPEARMAN PRESENT FOR DEFT, CONVERGEONE, INC.; MOTION; CONVERGEONE, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL IS HEARD.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OPPOSITION AND REPLY READ AND CONSIDERED; TENTATIVE RULING TO DENY MOTION GIVEN.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; CONVERGEONE, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL IS DENIED.; TRIAL/COURT DATES CONFIRMED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: TO SEVER TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18 FILED BY CONVERGEONE, INC.. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO BIFURCATE SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELIA FLORES (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • FILE RETAINED IN DEPT FOR UPCOMING HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COURTS RULING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF L. ROCCHETTI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LEWIS ROCCHETTI; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ASHLEY RAYFIELD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DELIA FLORES.; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY HODGE PRESENT FOR LEWIS ROCCHETTI.; GARY LOFTI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JUAN AYALA ROMAN, ESTEVES LOGISTICS CORP., A CORPORATION.; JUSTIN SPEARMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CONVERGEONE, INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; MOTION; LEWIS ROCCHETTI'S MOTION DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS HEARD.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OPPOSITION AND REPLY READ AND CONSIDERED.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE SETTLEMENT WAS ENTERED IN GOOD FAITH.; LEWIS ROCCHETTI'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 08/16/18 MINUTE ORDER AND COPY OF COURTS RULING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/16/18 FILED BY LEWIS ROCCHETTI. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • PLAINTIFF DELIA FLORES FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DELIA FLORES.; Minutes; Receipt: 161205-0513 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DELIA FLORES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161205-0512 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/05/2016 OF DELIA FLORES - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY DELIA FLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less