This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:51:06 (UTC).

FLORES-V-CITY OF ONTARIO

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 FLORES-V-CITY OF ONTARIO was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9550

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILLIAN FLORES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CAMILLA ANN COULTER

RICHARD S COULTER

CITY OF ONTARIO

NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO

CAMILLA M. COULTER

RICHARD S. COULTER

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CAMILLA M. COULTER

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

RICHARD S. COULTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW ZEYTUNTSYAN, PC

1306 Magnolia Blvd

Burbank, CA 91506

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RINOS & MARTIN

17822 17Th Street Suite 401

Tustin, CA 92780

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2019 OF RICHARD COULTER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2019 OF RICHARD COULTER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2019 OF CITY OF ONTARIO BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2019 OF CITY OF ONTARIO BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER

ANSWER FILED BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CAMILLA ANN COULTER SERVED ON 03/21/19 WITH FEES OF $97.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CAMILLA ANN COULTER SERVED ON 03/21/19 WITH FEES OF $97.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RICHARD S COULTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/19/19 WITH COSTS OF $144.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RICHARD S COULTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/19/19 WITH COSTS OF $144.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2019 OF CITY OF ONTARIO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2019 OF CITY OF ONTARIO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/13/2018 OF LILLIAN FLORES BY CITY OF ONTARIO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/13/2018 OF LILLIAN FLORES BY CITY OF ONTARIO

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RINOS & MARTIN.

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RINOS & MARTIN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF ONTARIO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $124.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF ONTARIO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $124.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW ZEYTUNTSYAN RE HRG APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NINE TANGO DEVELOPMENT LTD LIABILITY CO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DEFENDANT RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • PLAINTIFF RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER.; Minutes; Receipt: 190513-0596 $150.00; 190513-0596-CK Reference Number CK D3679071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190513-0593 $870.00; 190513-0593-CK Reference Number CK D3679071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 05/13/2019 OF RICHARD COULTER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RICHARD S. COULTER, CAMILLA M. COULTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR CITY OF ONTARIO ARE WAIVED FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF ONTARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RINOS & MARTIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF ONTARIO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $124.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LILLIAN FLORES FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 181113-0809 $435.00; 181113-0809-CK Reference Number CK 42335

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.