This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:09:04 (UTC).

FLORENCE DAUZ -N- DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 FLORENCE DAUZ -N- DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8619

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Other

FLORENCE DAUZ

Respondents and Others

DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ

FLORENCE DAUZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF FLORENCE DAUZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER FLORENCE DAUZ PRESENT; RESPONDENT DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; 10:54; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT INQUIRES OF THE PARTIES.; BY ORAL STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; THIS IS A 9 YEAR, 6 MONTH MARRIAGE. THE DATE OF SEPARATION IS 09-27-2017.; PARTIES STATE THE FAMILY RESIDENCE SOLD FOR $460,000.00 AND THERE IS CURRENTLY NO DEBT.; 11:55; COURT IN RECESS.; 01:40; COURT RECONVENES -BOTH PARTIES PRESENT IN THEIR PLACES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDINGS ARE RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; THE COURT ORDERS:; SPOUSAL SUPPORT:; SPOUSAL SUPPORT TO BE SET AT ZERO AND CONTINUING UNTIL THERE IS A CHANGE OF CIRCUMSTANCE, DEATH; OF EITHER PARTY OR REMARRIAGE.; CHILD SUPPORT:; IS SET AT ZERO. PARTIES STATE THERE IS AN OPEN CASE WITH RIVERSIDE COUNTY.; THE COURT ADMONISHES RESPONDENT THAT IT IS THE GOAL OF THIS STATE THAT EACH PARTY WILL MAKE REASONABLE GOOD FAITH EFFORTS TO BECOME SELF-SUPPORTING ASAS PROVIDED FOR IN FAMILY CODE SECTION 4320.; THE FAILURE TO MAKE REASONABLE GOOD FAITH EFFORTS MAY BE ONE OF THE FACTORS CONSIDERED BY THE COURT AS A BASIS FOR MODIFYING OR TERMINATING SPOUSAL SUPPORT IN THE FUTURE.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: SPOUSAL SUPPORT.; RESPONDENT DOMEL DAUZ IS ENTITLED TO ONE-HALF OF THE 2017 TAX REFUND OF $2800.00. PETITIONER; FLORENCE DAUZ IS TO PAY RESPONDENT DOMEL DAUZ $1400.00.; TAXES:; MOTHER SHALL CLAIM THE MINOR CHILD ON EVEN YEARS AND THE FATHER ON ODD YEARS.; BOTH PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO FULLY COOPERATE WITH SIGNING ANY FORMS NECESSARY FOR THE TAX; PREPARTION.; ***STATUS TAKEN***; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET.; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ ON 10/24/17; BY FILING OF RESPONSE.; BOTH PARTIES WAIVE THE FINAL PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE.; DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; UPON ENTRY OF THE FINAL DECREE, FLORENCE DAUZ'S FORMER NAME, FLORENCE PULIDO GALEON SHALL BE RESTORED TO HER.; MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT; NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: ANY UNRESOLVED MATTERS.; FLORENCE DAUZ TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; PETITIONER IS REFERRED TO THE FAMILY LAW RESOURCE CENTER FOR FURTHER ASSITANCE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECL - 2017 TAXE, PAYSTUBS BY MAIL ON 04/09/18 AS TO DOMEL DAUZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DECLARATION OF YOLANDA MENDOZA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DOMEL HULIGANGA DAUZ FOR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF IE/SCHEDULE OF A&D/FINAL DECL OF DISCLOSURE BY MAIL ON 04/09/18 AS TO FLORENCE DAUZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180409-0079 $0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY FLORENCE DAUZ FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SCHEDULE OF ASSETS & DEBTS BY MAIL ON 02/20/18 AS TO DOMEL HULIGANGA DUAZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON FLORENCE DAUZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY FLORENCE DAUZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY FLORENCE DAUZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO FLORENCE DAUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less