This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 14:06:10 (UTC).

FLASHBYTE DIGITAL-V-MOJAVE WIFI

Case Summary

On 12/10/2010 FLASHBYTE DIGITAL-V-MOJAVE WIFI was filed as a Contract - Business lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0309

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

FLASHBYTE DIGITAL,LLC

Defendants and Appellants

MATT VILLARREAL

MOJAVE WIFI

AMANDA VILLARREAL

Defendants and Respondents

JEFF BILLINGTON

MATT VILLARREAL

TILE & ART DESIGN WORKS BY PEPPER GALLERY

GREG HERRING

RYAN BROOKS

RICHARD DERIDDER

PEPPER WAGNER

WENDY COHEN

MOJAVE WIFI

MARGE DOYLE

JACK KENNEDY

MICHAEL VILLARREAL

AMANDA VILLARREAL

JOSHUA TREE LAKE RV AND CAMPGROUND

KENNETH JAYES

FLASHBYTE DIGITAL,LLC

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

GLEN BROEMER

11770 Pacific Coast Hwy Apt D

Malibu, CA 90265-2202

BROEMER, GLEN

Box 211

Port Hueneme, CA 93044

Defendant, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

TETLEY LAW OFFICES

22365 Barton Rd Ste 206

Grand Terrace, CA 92313

HOSP,GILBERT,BERGSTEN & HOUGH

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 401

Pasadena, CA 91101

GLEN BROEMER

11770 Pacific Coast Hwy Apt D

Malibu, CA 90265-2202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2013
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • APPEAL IS DISMISSED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DCA ORDER RE APPEAL: APPEAL IS DISMISSED FAILURE TO PAY PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 028-0088799832

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MOJAVE WIFI FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 130716-0344 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • APPEAL ON A ORDER FILED 06/24/2013 OF MOJAVE WIFI IS ABANDONED -- SIGNED ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FORM IS RECEIVED BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF FLASHBYTE DIGITAL,LLC, MICHAEL VILLARREAL, PEPPER WAGNER, TILE & ART DESIGN WORKS BY PEPPER GALLERY, RICHARD DERIDDER, KENNETH JAYES, JOSHUA TREE LAKE RVAND CAMPGROUND, RYAN BROOKS, WENDY COHEN, MARGE DOYLE, JACK KENNEDY IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF FLASHBYTE DIGITAL,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • STIPULATION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF MTN/MTN FOR ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION FILED BY FLASHBYTE DIGITAL,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110503-0797 $395.00; 110503-0797-CK Reference Number 1900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.