This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:57:17 (UTC).

FLANAGAN, ET AL.-V-METRO ACURA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 FLANAGAN, -V-METRO ACURA was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1674

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINH HUYNH

RAYMOND GONZALEZ

GREG FLANAGAN

Defendants

HECTOR RUIZ

ANDY DOBLER

METRO ACURA

METRO MOTORS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRO, SANDRA H

3200 Inland Empire Blvd Suite 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS PC

200 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ANDY DOBLER FILED

DECLARATION OF ANDY DOBLER FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON METRO ACURA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/02/16 WITH COSTS OF $58.65 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON METRO ACURA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/02/16 WITH COSTS OF $58.65 FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED.

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE FILED BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH.

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE FILED BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH.

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY METRO MOTORS, INC.

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY METRO MOTORS, INC.

COURTS WRITTEN RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED.

COURTS WRITTEN RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF ALISON L LYNCH FILED

DECLARATION OF ALISON L LYNCH FILED

ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH.

REPLY TO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLA CLAIMS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/26/17 FILED BY METRO MOTORS, INC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SPPT TO MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLA CLAIMS SET FOR HEARING ON 01/26/17 FILED BY METRO MOTORS, INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/26/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 01/26/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ANDY DOBLER, HECTOR RUIZ, METRO MOTORS, INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ANDY DOBLER, HECTOR RUIZ, METRO MOTORS, INC.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED *S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCES BY EITHER SIDE TO STATE A REASON CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED DUE; TO THE FILING OF A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, THE COURT HEREBY DISMISSES THE ABOVE CASE.; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED; NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREG FLANAGAN FOR FAX FE; Minutes; Receipt: 180215-1115 $5.00; 180215-1115-VS Reference Number 033-0054192010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREG FLANAGAN FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180215-0335 $9.00; 180215-0335-VS Reference Number 033-0054192010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GREG FLANAGAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • FILE SENT TO S32 FOR 08/09 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH FOR COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0241 $2.00; 160209-0241-VS Reference Number 023-0249093975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH FOR FAX AND MAILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0246 $33.71; 160209-0246-VS Reference Number 023-0249093975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREG FLANAGAN, RAYMOND GONZALEZ, VINH HUYNH FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0236 $435.00; 160209-0236-VS Reference Number 023-0249093975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less