This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 10:53:15 (UTC).

FISHER-V-DE BIE; ABMA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 FISHER-V-DE BIE ABMA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0790

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES L FISHER

Defendants

ANTHONY DE BIE

ELAINE ABMA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ELAINE ABMA; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ELAINE ABMA; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANTHONY DE BIE; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANTHONY DE BIE; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:08; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MR ONNE JOHN ABMA APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANTS AND SIGNED A STIPULATION ON THEIR BEHALF; THE COURT CANNOT ACCEPT A STIPULATION NOT SIGNED BY THE ACTUAL DEFENDANTS; PLAINTIFF WILL PROVE UP THE CASE AND GIVE THE SAME TERMS AS THE STIPULATION; WITNESS -- JAMES FISHER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF JAMES FISHER ORDERED ENTERED 03/10/16; JUDGMENT FOR: JAMES L FISHER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,675.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $345.00 AND DAMAGES $2,242.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,762.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/28/16.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; 09:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1097 $255.00; 160201-1097-CK Reference Number 77758

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED WRIT OVER THE COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED WRIT OVER THE COUNTER)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/04/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/04/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF TRIAL RECEIVED BACK FROM UNABLE TO FORWARD/ELAINE ABMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED WRIT OVER THE COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 160310-0213 $25.00; 160310-0213-CK Reference Number 77935

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:08; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MR ONNE JOHN ABMA APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANTS AND SIGNED A STIPULATION ON THEIR BEHALF; THE COURT CANNOT ACCEPT A STIPULATION NOT SIGNED BY THE ACTUAL DEFENDANTS; PLAINTIFF WILL PROVE UP THE CASE AND GIVE THE SAME TERMS AS THE STIPULATION; WITNESS -- JAMES FISHER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF JAMES FISHER ORDERED ENTERED 03/10/16; JUDGMENT FOR: JAMES L FISHER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,675.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $345.00 AND DAMAGES $2,242.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,762.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/28/16.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; 09:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PARTY JAMES L FISHER UPDATED: CORRECTING PLAINTIFF TO REFLECT NOT BUSINESS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY DE BIE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANTHONY DE BIE FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ELAINE ABMA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ELAINE ABMA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY DE BIE, ELAINE ABMA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1097 $255.00; 160201-1097-CK Reference Number 77758

    Read MoreRead Less