This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/25/2022 at 05:36:41 (UTC).

FIRE -v- Estrada

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 FIRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Estrada. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Burdick, John and John W Burdick. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Burdick, John

John W Burdick

 

Party Details

Defendant

Estrada, Paul

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

Document

Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Authorization to Appear Filed

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Authorization to Appear Filed

* Public *

Authorization to Appear Filed

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Authorization to Appear Filed

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: $1,617.70; Department: Department M4 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Burdick, John; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Foster (Atkinson), Cheri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Case ordered dismissed in its Entirety; Comments: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: FIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: ($1,617.70); Department: Department M4 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Burdick, John; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Foster (Atkinson), Cheri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: FIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: ($1,617.70); Department: Department M4 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Burdick, John; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Foster (Atkinson), Cheri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: FIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: FIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: 1617.70; Department: Department M4 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Burdick, John; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Foster (Atkinson), Cheri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: FIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed; Filed By: FIRE; Comments: Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Plaintiff's Claim; Type: Action; Description: Emergency Services rendered at 57840 29 Palms Hwy, Yucca Valley, CA 92284

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less