This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/23/2018 at 04:29:49 (UTC).

FINE VS SWANLUND

Case Summary

On 06/28/2010 FINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SWANLUND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0651

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC

Defendants

AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC

DAVID E SWANLUND

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100629-4001 $75.00; 100629-4001-CK Reference Number 5152

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO DAVID E SWANLUND. PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SS. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO DAVID E SWANLUND. PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SS. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID E SWANLUND. (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID E SWANLUND. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100916-1622 $20.00

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PAYMENTS FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PAYMENTS FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2012
  • DECLARATION RE:DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PAYMENTS WERE NOT ORDERED ON THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $278.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/29/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: PAYMENTS FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 06/28/2010 OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC, AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: C SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC REPRESENTED BY SHANDA WYATT.; DEFENDANT DAVID E SWANLUND PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 10:20; WITNESS -- DAVID SWANLUND IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT STATES THAT THE DEFENDANT SHOULD BE AVA TERMITE AND PEST; DAVID E SWANLUND'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 06/28/2010 OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 06/28/2010 OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC ORDERED ENTERED 10/15/10; DEFENDANT IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THE DEFENDANT TO BE AVA TERMITE AND PEST; CONTROL LLC; ON PLAINTIFFS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID E SWANLUND WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; JUDGMENT FOR: FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AVA TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,000.00; SEE STIP FOR PAYMENT TERMS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID E SWANLUND. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100916-1622 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/26/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS PRESIDING.; CLERK: TANYA PIRDY; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC REPRESENTED BY SHANDA WYATT.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; 10:26; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; DAVID E SWANLUND NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; SHANDA WYATT IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; JUDGMENT:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DAVID E SWANLUND.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT 000100 HAVE &; RECOVER FROM 000100.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $110.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,110.00; ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS CANCELLED.; DOCUMENTS RETURNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO DAVID E SWANLUND. PARTY SERVED ON 07/21/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SS. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100629-4001 $75.00; 100629-4001-CK Reference Number 5152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINE COMMUNITY PHONE BOOKS, INC is a litigant