This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 01:13:18 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES -v- CAZARES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 FIA CARD SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAZARES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6089

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A.,

Defendant

GRACIELA CAZARES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Suite 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2910.61 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A., FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 161017-0633 $25.00; 161017-0633-CK Reference Number 516731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $2,845.61 ); Minutes; Receipt: 150902-2718 $25.00; 150902-2718-CK Reference Number 474050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BLEIER & COX WITH NELSON & KENNARD AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A.,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 111021-2910 $25.00; 111021-2910-CK Reference Number 016816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GRACIELA CAZARES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A., ORDERED ENTERED 08/12/11; JUDGMENT FOR: FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A.,; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GRACIELA CAZARES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,528.61 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $292.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,820.61; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033(B) FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVING ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY FIA CARD SERVICES,N.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GRACIELA CAZARES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/27/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110517-0150 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less