This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:23:50 (UTC).

FERRIS FAMILY LIV V TUMEY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2011 FERRIS FAMILY LIV filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TUMEY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0357

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRIS FAMILY LIV REV 2000

Defendant

KENNETH R TUMEY

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RM SCHLOSSER, ATTORNEY AT LAW

512 East 4Th Street Suite 318

Ontario, CA 91764

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110803-2454 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RANDY SCHLOSSER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT KENNETH R TUMEY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF RE: DAMAGES FILED.; 09:18; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; GEORGE GUERRERO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 1- LEASE AGREEMENT MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 2- 60-DAY NOTICE & PROOF OF SERVICE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 1 AND 2 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; WITNESS GEORGE GUERRERO EXCUSED.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; KENNETH R. TUMEY IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; WITNESS SUBMITS COPIES OF LETTERS FOR COURTS REVIEW. COURT REVIEWS AND RETURNS DOCUMENTS TO; WITNESS; WITNESS KENNETH R. TUMEY EXCUSED.; CONNIE SCHOFIELD IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; WITNESS CONNIE SCHOFIELD EXCUSED.; DEFENSE WITNESS KENNETH R. TUMEY RESUMES TESTIMONY, STILL UNDER OATH.; WITNESS KENNETH R. TUMEY EXCUSED.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; 09:35; PROPOSED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/30/2011 OF FERRIS FAMILY LIV REV 2000 ORDERED ENTERED 07/29/11; JUDGMENT FOR: FERRIS FAMILY LIV REV 2000; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH R TUMEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,355.00; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KENNETH R TUMEY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); JUDGMENT SIGNED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/30/2011 OF FERRIS FAMILY LIV REV 2000 AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/30/2011 OF FERRIS FAMILY LIV REV 2000, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/03/11 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KENNETH R TUMEY SERVED ON 07/03/11 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY KENNETH R TUMEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 110706-2839 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110630-1266 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.