This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 00:00:54 (UTC).

FERNANDEZ ET AL -V- INLAND BEHAVIORAL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2016 FERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against INLAND BEHAVIORAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9738

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THUY NGUYEN

GREGORIO FERNANDEZ

Defendant

INLAND BEHAVIORAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER & PELAYES, LLP

1325 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: STAY CASE PENDING PRIVATE MEDIATION BETWEEN PARTIE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: STAY CASE PENDING PRIVATE MEDIATION BETWEEN PARTIE FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN.

NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN.

NOTICE OF RULING AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INLAND BEHAVIORAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON INLAND BEHAVIORAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY INLAND BEHAVIORAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY JACKSON LEWIS P.C..

ANSWER FILED BY INLAND BEHAVIORAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY JACKSON LEWIS P.C..; Minutes; Receipt: 170113-0466 $435.00

NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURNED SENT.

NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURNED SENT.; Minutes; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO LILLY SALIDO, FOR TEMETRY ANN LINDSEY IS RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASONS: PARTY LISTED AS BEING SERVED IS NOT LISTED ON THE; CASE. IF THE PERSON SERVED IS ON BEHALF OF A CORPORATION OR OTHER FORM OF COMPANY PLEASE; INDICATE SO ON THE PROOF OF SERVICE. IF THE PERSON SERVED IS BEING SERVED ON BEHALF; OF A PERSON THEN SUBSTITUTE SERVICE IS BEING MADE WHICH REQUIRES DECLARATION OF ATTEMPTED; SERVICE ALONG WITH DECLARATION OF MAILING. PLEASE MAKE THE NECESSARY CORRECTIONS AND; RE-SUBMIT FOR PROCESSING.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0209 $4.00; 170928-0209-VS Reference Number 033-0035214272

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN FOR COPY FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161121-0124 $2.00; 161121-0124-VS Reference Number 026-0000166715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • PLAINTIFF GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161121-0123 $22.00; 161121-0123-VS Reference Number 026-0000166715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREGORIO FERNANDEZ, THUY NGUYEN FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161121-0121 $435.00; 161121-0121-VS Reference Number 026-0000166715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.