This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:01:47 (UTC).

FELIX HERNANDEZ -V- TOMMY BAHAMA GROUP, INC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 FELIX HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against TOMMY BAHAMA GROUP, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1349

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELIX HERNANDEZ

Defendants

TOMMY BAHAMA GROUP, INC.

VIEWPOINT MARKETING, INC

TOMMY BAHAMA R&R HOLDINGS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINEMAN & POLINER LLP

155 North Riverview Drive

Anaheim Hills, CA 92808

Defendant Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAPTON

501 West Broadway 19Th Fl Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: FINAL FAIRNESS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT AND FINAL APPROVAL ORDER FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF FELIX HERNANDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 02/07/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FELIX HERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VIEWPOINT MARKETING, INC, TOMMY BAHAMA R&R HOLDINGS, INC; PLEASE SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NEIL B FINEMAN RE CLASS NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: JOHN C. DINEEN RE DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS NOTICE FILED BY VIEWPOINT MARKETING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • MOTION RE: FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FELIX HERNANDEZ; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; NEIL B FINEMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FELIX HERNANDEZ.; ATTORNEY JOHN C DINEEN PRESENT FOR DEFT T BAHAMA ETC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO OPPOSITION FILED; COURT FINDS:; FELIX HERNANDEZ'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FINAL FAIRNESS SET FOR 02/23/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • FILE ROUTED TO S31 FOR 11/17 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TOMMY BAHAMA GROUP,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/08/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED BY FELIX HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FELIX HERNANDEZ FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-2749 $435.00; 160201-2749-CK Reference Number #14463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF FELIX HERNANDEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less