This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:22:30 (UTC).

FELIPE DE JESUS LEAL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 FELIPE DE JESUS LEAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0927

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

MARIA LEAL

Decedent

FELIPE DE JESUS LEAL

Minor

MINOR CHILDREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CENTENO, JOSHUA W

10700 Civic Center Drive Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

ROSS, LINDA ROBERTS

35141 Yucaipa Blvd

Yucaipa, CA 92399

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND REQUEST FOR RETURN OF FILED BY MARIA LEAL

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND REQUEST FOR RETURN OF FILED BY MARIA LEAL

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND REQUEST FOR RETURN OF FILED BY MARIA LEAL

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND REQUEST FOR RETURN OF FILED BY MARIA LEAL

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA LEAL

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED BY MARIA LEAL(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED BY MARIA LEAL(PROBATE).

HRG OF 04/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET OF NOTICE FILED.

MAILING COVER SHEET OF NOTICE FILED.

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 11/23/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 11/23/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171130-0281 $25.50; 171130-0281-DB Reference Number 030419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, FELICITAS HERNANDEZ APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA CENTENO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; FELICITAS HERNANDEZ PRESENT.; ROSSIE LEAL PRESENT.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY E. JOAN NELMS FOR LINDA ROBERTS ROSS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); ON COURTS MOTION, PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED 08/31/2017; IS DISMISSED AT MOVING PARTYS REQUEST.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA CENTENO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; FELICITAS HERNANDEZ PRESENT.; ROSSIE LEAL PRESENT.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY E.JOAN NELMS FOR LINDA ROBERTS ROSS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/15/2016 OF FELICITAS HERNANDEZ IS GRANTED; FELICITAS HERNANDEZ IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ADMINISTRATOR WILL NEED COURT APPROVAL TO SELL; PROPERTY; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 02/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/15/2016 OF FELICITAS HERNANDEZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; PROCEEDINGS:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA CENTENO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; FELICITAS HERNANDEZ PRESENT.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY E.JOAN NELMS FOR LINDA ROBERTS ROSS.; MARIA LEAL PRESENT.; ROSSIE LEAL PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WRITTEN SETTLEMENT PROVIDED TO THE COURT.; ALL PARTIES HAVING SIGNED THE WRITTEN SETTLEMENT; COURT APPROVES AND SIGNS.; COUNSEL TO FILE WRITTEN SETTLEMENT WITH THE CLERKS; OFFICE TODAY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGGREEMENT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 11/23/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSHUA CENTENO PRESENT FOR FELICITAS HERNANDEZ, PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER NOT ON COURTS CALENDAR FOR TODAYS DATE, AND SO MATTER WAS NOT CALLED ON THE RECORD.; PETITION IS CONTINUED TO JANUARY 18, 2017 IN DEPARTMENT S37 AT 8:30AM.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 01/18/17 CONFIRMED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 11/23/16 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY FELICITAS HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0009 $465.00; 160916-0009-CK Reference Number 1078

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.