This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 07:53:46 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL -V- OLIVE MINTAH

Case Summary

On 08/14/2011 FEDERAL NATIONAL filed an Other lawsuit against OLIVE MINTAH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

OLIVE R MINTAH

Respondent

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

GLENN H WESCHLER LAW OFFICES

1111 Civic Drive Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 01/28/13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketNOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketHEARING ON APPEAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: CYNTHIA GOMEZ; CLERK: CAROLYN SOLBERG; COURT REPORTER VICTORIA VILLEGAS 9843; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; BAILIFF: A SERRANO; ATTORNEY NATALIE S. MANDELIN PRESENT FOR FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON APPEAL.; CASE SUBMITTED ON BRIEFS.; THE JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON ORAL ARGUMENT - JANUARY 25, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT S32 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION OR MODIFICATION OF STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/27/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/16/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketLATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING OPENING BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 01/28/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT 1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDFS1101072 - FONTANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketCASE STAYED PENDING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant