Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/18/2018 at 12:47:14 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSN -V- COON

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendant

KRIS COON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENN H WESCHLER LAW OFFICES

1111 Civic Drive Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

DECLARATION OF GLENN H WECHSLER FILED

DECLARATION OF GLENN H WECHSLER FILED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTORNEY ON 10/10/18)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTORNEY ON 10/10/18)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/12/2018 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION ORDERED ENTERED 10/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/13/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/13/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KRIS COON; PARTY SERVED ON 09/12/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $99.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KRIS COON; PARTY SERVED ON 09/12/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $99.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180912-0104 $255.00; 180912-0104-CK Reference Number 38141

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FOR WRIT FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181011-0016 $25.00; 181011-0016-CK Reference Number 38243

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GLENN H WECHSLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTORNEY ON 10/10/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/12/2018 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION AS TO KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/12/2018 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION ORDERED ENTERED 10/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KRIS COON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/12/2018 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/13/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KRIS COON; PARTY SERVED ON 09/12/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $99.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • 12/03/18 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • 12/03/18 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180912-0104 $255.00; 180912-0104-CK Reference Number 38141

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant