This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 23:46:20 (UTC).

FARRELL -v- ZINUS, INC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 FARRELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZINUS, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Widman, Joseph B and Ortiz, Joseph T. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2835

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Widman, Joseph B

Ortiz, Joseph T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARRELL, JOSEPH D

Defendants

ZINUS, INC

JIYUN JEONG

 

Court Documents

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

12/14/2020: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

Claim of Plaintiff <$1500 Filed

12/14/2020: Claim of Plaintiff <$1500 Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Complaint

02/03/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ortiz, Joseph T; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: $252.12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Widman, Joseph B; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal - Before Hearing (SC); Party; Names; FARRELL, JOSEPH D; ZINUS, INC; Comment; Comment: (DISMISSED 02/03/21)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Complaint; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFARRELL, JOSEPH D; Turbo Court; Receipt # FO-2020-0025478; FARRELL, JOSEPH D; $45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFARRELL, JOSEPH D; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFARRELL, JOSEPH D; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: tracking# 7013 1710 0001 7638 8438

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialFARRELL, JOSEPH D; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff <$1500 Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zinus, Inc. is a litigant