This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 08:15:37 (UTC).

FAMSA VS MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 FAMSA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0675

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAMSA INC

Defendant

SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN FAMSA BIN ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120308-0057 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNDELIEVERABLE TO SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 07/01/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; FAMSA INC REPRESENTED BY LAURA HORTA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 10:01; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; LAURA HORTA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT FAMSA INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,625.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SAUL RODRIGUEZ MUNOZ. PARTY SERVED ON 06/03/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $25.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110509-2084 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less