This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:31:59 (UTC).

FALKENTHAL -V- WEBB

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 FALKENTHAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEBB. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1170

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL

Defendant

JOHN WEBB JR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN WEBB JR FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN WEBB JR FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOHN WEBB JR.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOHN WEBB JR.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL ORDERED ENTERED 07/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN WEBB JR; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,948.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $285.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,233.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $611.35)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $611.35)

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: 585 JUDGMENT PACKET IS READY TO SUBMIT TODAY; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT PACKET SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOHN WEBB JR SERVED ON 01/21/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOHN WEBB JR SERVED ON 01/21/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • MEMO OF COST IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF OF SERVICE ON MEMO OF COST IS NOT SIGNED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( 6844.35 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180720-0718 $25.00; 180720-0718-CK Reference Number 2444

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $611.35)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT PACKET; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL ORDERED ENTERED 07/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN WEBB JR; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,948.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $285.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,233.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOHN WEBB JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: 585 JUDGMENT PACKET IS READY TO SUBMIT TODAY; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT PACKET SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN WEBB JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL AS TO JOHN WEBB JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOHN WEBB JR SERVED ON 01/21/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0372 $240.00; 161214-0372-CK Reference Number 2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.