This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:31:51 (UTC).

FALKENTHAL -V- SUTTON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 FALKENTHAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUTTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1169

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Defendant

VANESSA D. SUTTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J FALKENTHAL

306 W 2Nd Street #300

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $756.75)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $756.75)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VANESSA D. SUTTON SERVED ON 05/17/17 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VANESSA D. SUTTON SERVED ON 05/17/17 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VANESSA D. SUTTON FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VANESSA D. SUTTON FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT; Disposition: Continued

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; THE COURT IS ADVISED THE JUDGMENT PACKET WAS MAILED BUT NOT YET RECEIVED BY THE CLERK.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:46; ACTION - COMPLETE

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL ORDERED ENTERED 08/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VANESSA D. SUTTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,756.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $360.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,116.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:03; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND HAS NOT EXPIRED YET.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( LA ); Minutes; Receipt: 180717-0937 $25.00; 180717-0937-CK Reference Number 2443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $756.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL ORDERED ENTERED 08/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VANESSA D. SUTTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,756.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $360.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,116.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; THE COURT IS ADVISED THE JUDGMENT PACKET WAS MAILED BUT NOT YET RECEIVED BY THE CLERK.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:46; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VANESSA D. SUTTON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ROBERT FALKENTHAL AS TO VANESSA D. SUTTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:03; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND HAS NOT EXPIRED YET.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VANESSA D. SUTTON SERVED ON 05/17/17 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT J. FALKENTHAL FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0358 $240.00; 161214-0358-CK Reference Number 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.