This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:50:14 (UTC).

EZ CASH-V-BELL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 EZ CASH-V-BELL was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0983

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZ CASH LLC

Defendant

JANAYA BELL

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINITFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JANAYA BELL. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINITFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JANAYA BELL. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1416 $100.00; 160201-1416-VS Reference Number 027-0299554322

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:49; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JANAYA BELL; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF STATES PROOF OF SERVICE WAS MAILED AND COURT HAS NOT RECEIVED IT AS OF THIS DATE. COURT; REQUIRES ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/29/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JANAYA BELL; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JANAYA BELL HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PAUL WITOWSKI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; **************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JANAYA BELL.; JUDGMENT FOR: EZ CASH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JANAYA BELL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $250.30 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $380.30; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160506-0024 $25.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160506-0024 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JANAYA BELL; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JANAYA BELL HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PAUL WITOWSKI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; **************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JANAYA BELL.; JUDGMENT FOR: EZ CASH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JANAYA BELL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $250.30 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $380.30; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:49; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JANAYA BELL; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF STATES PROOF OF SERVICE WAS MAILED AND COURT HAS NOT RECEIVED IT AS OF THIS DATE. COURT; REQUIRES ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/29/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINITFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JANAYA BELL. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EZ CASH LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1416 $100.00; 160201-1416-VS Reference Number 027-0299554322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less