This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:49:28 (UTC).

EZ CASH-V-AVILA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 EZ CASH-V-AVILA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0980

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZ CASH LLC

Defendant

VIRGINIA AVILA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1299 $100.00; 160201-1299-VS Reference Number 027-0299554322

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VIRGINIA AVILA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VIRGINIA AVILA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160506-0017 $25.00

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:30; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VIRGINIA AVILA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; VIRGINIA AVILA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PAUL WITOWSKI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VIRGINIA AVILA.; JUDGMENT FOR: EZ CASH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VIRGINIA AVILA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $315.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $445.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $48.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $48.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $48.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO CREDITOR ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160506-0017 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:30; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VIRGINIA AVILA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; VIRGINIA AVILA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PAUL WITOWSKI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VIRGINIA AVILA.; JUDGMENT FOR: EZ CASH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VIRGINIA AVILA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $315.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $445.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; EZ CASH LLC REPRESENTED BY PAUL WITOWSKI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VIRGINIA AVILA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF STATES THE PROOF OF SERVICE HAS BEEN MAILED AND THE COURT HAS NOT RECEIVED IT. COURT; NEEDS ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/29/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VIRGINIA AVILA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $100.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1299 $100.00; 160201-1299-VS Reference Number 027-0299554322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF EZ CASH LLC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less