This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 17:02:23 (UTC).

EXTRA SPACE -V- STEPHENS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 EXTRA SPACE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHENS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0248

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXTRA SPACE MANAGEMENT

Defendant

JAMES STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EXTRA SPACE MANAGEMENT, JAMES STEPHENS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:21; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE OF MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO JAMES STEPHENS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/11/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO JAMES STEPHENS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/11/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2017
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 04/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EXTRA SPACE MANAGEMENT, JAMES STEPHENS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:21; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE OF MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO JAMES STEPHENS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/11/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0996 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0999 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less