This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 10:08:21 (UTC).

EXECUTIVE-V-BONIFAZI

Case Summary

On 09/30/2010 EXECUTIVE-V-BONIFAZI was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0557

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP

Defendant

FRANK BONIFAZI

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2010 OF EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANK BONIFAZI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $445.00 AND DAMAGES $3,075.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,520.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 101018-2259 $25.00; 101018-2259-CK Reference Number 161805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FRANK BONIFAZI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2010 OF EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP AS TO FRANK BONIFAZI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/30/2010 OF EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP ORDERED ENTERED 10/18/10; JUDGMENT FOR: EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANK BONIFAZI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: FRANK BONIFAZI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK BONIFAZI; PARTY SERVED ON 09/30/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/30/2010 OF EXECUTIVE CAPITAL GROUP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/30/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100930-2584 $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.