This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 20:56:20 (UTC).

EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS -V- TRULINE PACKAGING

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against TRULINE PACKAGING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8146

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

YOUSSEFIAN, GEORGE

TRULINE PACKAGING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRK LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

Milord & Associates, PC

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous Opposition Filed

05/20/2021: Miscellaneous Opposition Filed

Reply Filed

05/20/2021: Reply Filed

Request for Judicial Notice Filed

05/14/2021: Request for Judicial Notice Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

05/14/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Motion re:

04/26/2021: Motion re:

Declaration Filed

03/30/2021: Declaration Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/24/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Miscellaneous Document Filed

12/15/2020: Miscellaneous Document Filed

NOTICE OF OSC RE- STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT. PLEASE T

09/25/2020: NOTICE OF OSC RE- STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT. PLEASE T

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED

09/25/2020: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLA'S EXPARTE HRG RE- OSC-TRO

09/22/2020: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLA'S EXPARTE HRG RE- OSC-TRO

DECLARATION RE- KELLY BRANCH RE- NOTICE OF EX-PART

09/14/2020: DECLARATION RE- KELLY BRANCH RE- NOTICE OF EX-PART

EX PARTE OSC-TRO; MEMO P&A'S; AFFIDAVIT OF K. BUIR

09/14/2020: EX PARTE OSC-TRO; MEMO P&A'S; AFFIDAVIT OF K. BUIR

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

09/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

09/14/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/14/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

09/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

09/14/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2021

DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint; memorandum in support; and declaration of Dawn Kirk, Esq.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

FinancialEXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-28945; KRK LAW GROUP; $32.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

FinancialEXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment; $32.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $32.00 Mastercard paid on 5/20/21 for fax fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Opposition Filed; Comment: Plaintiff Excel Packaging Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice; Declaration of Jacob R. Rosenbaum in support thereof

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketReply Filed; Comment: by Plaintiff in support of its Motion for leave to file Second Amend Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Filed; Comment: By Defendant Truline Packaging re Opposition to Motion to file Second Amended Complain

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Truline Packaging

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2021

FinancialEXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-22590; S.A.S. LLC P.O. box 1568 Riverside, Ca 92502; $90.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: KELLY BRANCH RE: NOTICE OF EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FILED BY EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte Filed; Comment: EX PARTE OSC/TRO; MEMO P&A'S; AFFIDAVIT OF K. BUIRLEY... FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. FOR EX PARTE MOTION 200914-0159-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 200914-0159-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 5147

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY EXCEL PACKAGING SYSTEMS, INC. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE 200914-0157-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200914-0157-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 5147

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less