This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 17:47:33 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSUR -V- AFW SHEETMETAL CORP

Case Summary

On 03/02/2010 EVEREST NATIONAL INSUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AFW SHEETMETAL CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2043

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREMER WHYTEBROWN & O'MEARA

21215 Burbank Blvd Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 09/29/10; JUDGMENT FOR: EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,016.00 INTEREST $921.08 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $395.71 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,332.79; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

INTEREST COMPUTATION MADE TO CRC3.1800(A)(3) FILED.

INTEREST COMPUTATION MADE TO CRC3.1800(A)(3) FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

SUMMARY OF CASE MADE PURSUANT TO CRC3.1800(A)(1) FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE MADE PURSUANT TO CRC3.1800(A)(1) FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION.

DECLARATION OF GEORGETTE SADUSK FILED

DECLARATION OF GEORGETTE SADUSK FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION. PARTY SERVED ON 07/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $109.18.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION. PARTY SERVED ON 07/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $109.18.

ORDER GRANTING EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE TO SEC OF STATE FILED

ORDER GRANTING EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE TO SEC OF STATE FILED

NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN PRICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN PRICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE BY DELIVERY (05/12/10) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE BY DELIVERY (05/12/10) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Minutes; Receipt: 100512-1204 $40.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100302-2551 $220.00

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2010
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 101025-3704 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP585; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 09/29/10; JUDGMENT FOR: EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,016.00 INTEREST $921.08 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $395.71 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,332.79; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • INTEREST COMPUTATION MADE TO CRC3.1800(A)(3) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF CASE MADE PURSUANT TO CRC3.1800(A)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GEORGETTE SADUSK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: LOIS M. PAHIA; COURT REPORTER NANCY HERALDEZ 8191; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN L PRICE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF TO ALLOW TIME TO SUBMIT 585CCP DEFAULT PKG.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP585 SET FOR 10/15/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO PRESIDING.; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER NANCY HERALDEZ 8191; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN L PRICE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/30/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/15/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10; NOTICE WAIVED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER FILED BY EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO PRESIDING.; CLERK: LOIS M. PAHIA; COURT REPORTER FRED BERZAK 5815; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN L PRICE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AFW SHEETMETAL CORPORATION; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF; TO TRAIL MOTION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/10/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN PRICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE BY DELIVERY (05/12/10) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Minutes; Receipt: 100512-1204 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/02/2010 OF EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100302-2551 $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.