This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:41:59 (UTC).

EULOGIO L BANUELOS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 EULOGIO L BANUELOS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0998

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RALPH BANUELOS

Decedent

EULOGIO L BANUELOS

Not Classified By Court

HENRY MAURICIO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD B FISCHEL &ASSOCIATES

459 West 4Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Not Classified By Court Attorney

THE WERNER LAW FIRM

27257 1/2 Camp Plenty Road

Santa Clarita, CA 91351

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

VERIFICATION/JOINDER OF HENRY MAURICIO, JR., ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

VERIFICATION/JOINDER OF HENRY MAURICIO, JR., ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

RESPONSE TO CALENDAR NOTE 2 FILED.

RESPONSE TO CALENDAR NOTE 2 FILED.

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY RALPH BANUELOS.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY RALPH BANUELOS.

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED BY HENRY MAURICIO , JR

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED BY HENRY MAURICIO , JR

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RALPH BANUELOS FOR CC OF ORDR; Minutes; Receipt: 180416-0432 $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RALPH BANUELOS FOR CC OF ORDR ]; Minutes; Receipt: 180416-0083 $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD FISCHEL PRESENT FOR RALPH BANUELOS.; RALPH BANUELOS PRESENT.; HENRY MAURICIO JR PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 10/04/2017 OF RALPH BANUELOS IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 10/04/2017 OF RALPH BANUELOS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFICATION/JOINDER OF HENRY MAURICIO, JR., ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD FISCHEL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY RANDY GRUEN APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; HENRY MAURICIO JR PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT TENTATIVELY DECIDES EACH BROTHER AND SURVIVING SPOUSE ARE ENTITLED TO A 1/3 SHARE.; PETITIONER REQUESTS TIME TO SPEAK WITH HIS COUNSEL; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE REAL PROPERTY NOT BE SOLD OR ENCOMBERED WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER OF THE; COURT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/16/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED BY HENRY MAURICIO , JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ON THE PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 10/04/2017 OF RALPH BANUELOS, HENRY MAURICIO JR IS ADDED AS A OBJECTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RALPH BANUELOS FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0729 $465.00; 171004-0729-CK Reference Number #5930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less