This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:07:35 (UTC).

ETHAN MATTHEW MIZERA

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 ETHAN MATTHEW MIZERA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0870

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA

Decedent

ETHAN MATTHEW MIZERA

Minor

SAVANNAH ELLEN MIZERA

 

Court Documents

COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO GAL AND PET MAILING COVER SHEET (IMAGED)

COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO GAL AND PET MAILING COVER SHEET (IMAGED)

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EA-116 ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING BY UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE ON 11/17/17 AS TO SHANTA JONES RUFFINS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF EA-116 ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING BY UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE ON 11/17/17 AS TO SHANTA JONES RUFFINS, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: PROOF OF BLOCKED ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • MINUTES OF 7/12/18 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: PROOF OF BLOCKED ACCOUNT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; THE COURT ORDERS KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA TO BE PRESENT AT NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTES 7/12/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • HRG OF 07/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HRG OF 07/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • HEARING RE: PROOF OF BLOCKED ACCOUNT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • HRG OF 04/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • HRG OF 04/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( GUARDIANSHIP OF ESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/30/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA FOR PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KIMBERLY LEZETTE AYALA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less