This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:58:47 (UTC).

ESTHER J RAYMOND -V- ASHLEIGH N STACY

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 ESTHER J RAYMOND -V- ASHLEIGH N STACY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2114

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESTHER J RAYMOND

Respondent

ASHLEIGH N STACY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF ESTHER RAYMOND FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF ESTHER RAYMOND ORDERED ENTERED 11/21/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 11/16/17 BY ESTHER J RAYMOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ESTHER J RAYMOND FOR WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASHLEIGH N STACY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF ESTHER RAYMOND AS TO ASHLEIGH N STACY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ESTHER J RAYMOND FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ASHLEIGH N STACY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ESTHER J RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF ESTHER J RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0619 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less