This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 04:29:40 (UTC).

ESTATE OF TROY CANSLER -V- STATER BROS

Case Summary

On 04/27/2016 ESTATE OF TROY CANSLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATER BROS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6462

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER

AUTUM CANSLER

KRYSTINA HANRAHAN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

STATE BROS. MARKETS

CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC

PACIFIC COAST MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

VINCENT DELEON

STATER BROS. MARKETS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

STATER BROS. MARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERAGOS & GERAGOS,APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Court Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HRG FILED.

STIPULATION RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HRG FILED.

STIPULATION RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HRG FILED.

STIPULATION RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HRG FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DECLARATION OF NOAH GELDBERG FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DECLARATION OF NOAH GELDBERG FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM FILED.

ORDER RE JOINT STIP RE RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HEARING FILED

ORDER RE JOINT STIP RE RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION HEARING FILED

ORDER (JOINT) STIPULATION RE RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATN HRG 040717 IN S31 AT 8:30 AM FILED

ORDER (JOINT) STIPULATION RE RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATN HRG 040717 IN S31 AT 8:30 AM FILED

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CASE; DECL OF BEN MEISELAS FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CASE; DECL OF BEN MEISELAS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; REQST FOR DISMISSAL OF X-COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: ATTORNEY; OF RECORD DOES NOT MATCH ATTORNEY SIGNING DOCUMENT

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC, PACIFIC COAST MANAGEMENT GROUP,INC..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC, PACIFIC COAST MANAGEMENT GROUP,INC..

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/27/2016 OF THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER BY STATER BROS. MARKETS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/27/2016 OF THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER BY STATER BROS. MARKETS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VINCENT DELEON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/20/16 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VINCENT DELEON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/20/16 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC SERVED ON 06/17/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC SERVED ON 06/17/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STATER BROS. MARKETS SERVED ON 06/21/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STATER BROS. MARKETS SERVED ON 06/21/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0725 $4.00; 170810-0725-MC Reference Number 033-0029162412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED AS OF 08/10/17 WITH PREJUDICE..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; BRUCE TODD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STATER BROS. MARKETS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REQUEST THE CROSS COMPLAINT DATED 8/19/16 BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: CROSS COMPLAINANTS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170808-0928 $4.00; 170808-0928-MC Reference Number 033-0028874333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/27/2016 OF THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER FILED BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER, AUTUM CANSLER, KRYSTINA HANRAHAN, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER, AUTUM CANSLER, KRYSTINA HANRAHAN, ON 08/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT FILE WHILE THERE ARE MORE THAN ONE ACTIVE COMPLAINTS..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0658 $4.00; 170728-0658-VS Reference Number 033-0027486666

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHAPMAN HEIGHTS YUCAIPA, LLC SERVED ON 06/17/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STATER BROS. MARKETS SERVED ON 06/21/16 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF TROYCANSLER, AUTUM CANSLER, KRYSTINA HANRAHAN FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160427-0641 $435.00; 160427-0641-CK Reference Number #097925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • PARTY STATER BROS. MARKETS UPDATED: DEF

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.