This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:00:04 (UTC).

ESTATE OF SHIRLEY ANN CLAY

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 ESTATE OF SHIRLEY ANN CLAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1066

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

Decedent

SHIRLEY ANN CLAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BORENSTEIN, HOWARD S

299 W Foothill Blvd Ste 270

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN DECEDENTS ESTATE FILED.

DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN DECEDENTS ESTATE FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

COPY OF WILL RECEIPT LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF WILL RECEIPT LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FILL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FILL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROBATE REFEREE MANISHA HUNTER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING PROBATE REFEREE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN DECEDENTS ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR PROBATE, LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA..; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HOWARD S. BORENSTEIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WILL ADMITTED.; PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 10/25/2017 OF JUSTIN KOVALSKI IS GRANTED; JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 04/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF WILL RECEIPT LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JUSTIN MATTHEW KOVALSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FILL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0653 $465.00; 171025-0653-CK Reference Number 20738

    Read MoreRead Less