This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:59:55 (UTC).

ESTATE OF LINDA MARIE ROSALES

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 ESTATE OF LINDA MARIE ROSALES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1065

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL A ROSALES

Decedent

LINDA MARIE ROSALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BERL HILLEL SELSKI

24832 Elena Dr

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

TEMPORARY LETTERS ISSUED

TEMPORARY LETTERS ISSUED

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHAEL A ROSALES APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHAEL A ROSALES APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TRO FILED

ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TRO FILED

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/22/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/22/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO & OSC BY FAX ON 01/08/18 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO & OSC BY FAX ON 01/08/18 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHAEL A. ROSALES APPOINTED WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, -- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, MICHAEL A. ROSALES APPOINTED WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, -- APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION W/LTD IAEA FILED BY MICHAEL A. ROSALES(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION W/LTD IAEA FILED BY MICHAEL A. ROSALES(PROBATE).

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • HEARING RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (RESTRAINING ORDER); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL NOR PETITIONER.; THE TEMPORARY ORDERS MADE ON 03/05/18 ARE HEREBY VACATED.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 04/01/19 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 04/23/18 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (RESTRAINING ORDER); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); ATTORNEY LAUREL HANDLEY SIGNED UP FOR COURTCALL - BUT NO APPEARANCE WAS MADE.; ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 04/23/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • HRG OF 04/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO FRANCHISE ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL A ROSALES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less