This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:41:30 (UTC).

ESPINOZA VS UNION PACIFIC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 ESPINOZA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1224

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID ESPINOZA

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.

FRANK ALLFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER M CARILLO

301 North 9Th Street Ste 101

Redlands, CA 92374

LAW OFFICE OF DAVID PHILIPSON

P.O. Box 2950

Big Bear Lake, CA 92315

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

4747 Executive Dr Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

ANSWER FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 170313-0904 $435.00; 170313-0904-CK Reference Number D3535502

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/13/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DAVID ESPINOZA

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DAVID ESPINOZA

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER M CARILLO WITH LAW OFFICE OF DAVIDPHILIPSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DAVID ESPINOZA.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER M CARILLO WITH LAW OFFICE OF DAVIDPHILIPSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DAVID ESPINOZA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/13/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE (DEFT. ALLFORD)/DISMISSAL/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRANDON HOWARD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID ESPINOZA.; ATTORNEY ADAM SLOUSTCHER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT INQUIRES FROM PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AS TO SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ALLFORD.; COURT INFORMS PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT HAS NOT BEEN SERVED AS OF THIS MOMENT,; DEFENDANT IS ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5-7 DAYS; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO BE SENT BY CLERK.; OTHER ORDERS: MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 6/29/18..; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 08/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/13/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRANDON HOWARD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID ESPINOZA.; ATTORNEY ADAM SLOUSTCHER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AT COURTS INQUIRY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS THEY HAVE NOT BEEN ABLE TO LOCATE DEFENDANT F.; ALLFORD IN ORDER TO EFFECT SERVICE. MORE TIME IS REQUESTED BY COUNSEL IN ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF; SERVICE WITH THE COURT. COURT REMINDS COUNSEL OF CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.110(B), WHICH STATES; SERVICE MUST BE COMPLETED WITHIN 60 DAYS OF FILING A COMPLAINT.; COURT GRANTS COUNSELS REQUEST AND CONTINUES THIS MATTER, IF DEFENDANT IS NOT SERVED PRIOR TO THE; NEXT HEARING MR. FRANK ALLFORD MAY BE DISMISSED. HEARING IS CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE (DEFT. ALLFORD)/DISMISSAL/TSC SET FOR 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DAVID ESPINOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER M CARILLO WITH LAW OFFICE OF DAVIDPHILIPSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DAVID ESPINOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD CO.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 170313-0904 $435.00; 170313-0904-CK Reference Number D3535502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF DAVID ESPINOZA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID ESPINOZA FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0596 $435.00; 161214-0596-CK Reference Number 102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.