This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 05:37:23 (UTC).

ERWIN R. MARTY -V- PEGGY MARTY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2010 ERWIN R MARTY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEGGY MARTY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERWIN R MARTY

Respondent

PEGGY MARTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

NELMS, E JOAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2011

DocketUPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR ERWIN R MARTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2011

DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARBARA L. BEARD WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ERWIN R MARTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2011

DocketSIGNED JUDGMENT FAXED TO NEEDLES COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2011

DocketVACATE MANSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/11 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT N1.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2011

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2011

DocketJUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2011

DocketFAX RCD FROM NEEDLES. FRWD TO B1 FOR SIGNATURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2011

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PEGGY MARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2011

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110415-1039 $9.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
11/24/2010

DocketAT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY 0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2010

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 100804-1584 $355.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2010

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PEGGY MARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2010

DocketRESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 06/10/2010 OF ERWIN MARTY BY PEGGY MARTY FILED. REPRESENTED BY E JOAN NELMS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2010

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PEGGY MARTY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/15/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketFAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ERWIN R MARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketFAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100610-1194 $355.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less