This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 14:53:41 (UTC).

ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ -V- RAILWORKS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAILWORKS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Poncin, Lynn and Sachs, Michael A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6136

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Poncin, Lynn

Sachs, Michael A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ, ERNESTO

RODRIGUEZ, CLAUDIA

IGUEZ, ESTATE OF DA NIEL E. RODR

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

ARY, SHAYNE

RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS, INC

RAILWORKS CORPORATION

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZIRI LAW GROUP, APC

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Yoka & Smith LLP

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

 

Court Documents

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

12/18/2020: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

12/18/2020: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

12/18/2020: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/18/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Case Management Conference Statement Filed

12/07/2020: Case Management Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

12/03/2020: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

12/01/2020: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

10/09/2020: INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

10/01/2020: INITIAL TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED B

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SHAYNE ARY -

06/15/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SHAYNE ARY -

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF

06/15/2020: CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF

ANSWER FILED BY SHAYNE ARY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY

06/15/2020: ANSWER FILED BY SHAYNE ARY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

06/02/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING RE- OSC AND TSC FILED BY ERNESTO

03/11/2020: NOTICE OF RULING RE- OSC AND TSC FILED BY ERNESTO

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DEFENDANT RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS, INC NOTICE OF P

02/26/2020: DEFENDANT RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS, INC NOTICE OF P

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

02/25/2020: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE- NAME OF DEFENDANT FILED BY RA

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE- NAME OF DEFENDANT FILED BY RA

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Trial Readiness Conference Orders

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther Hearing; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: PLtfs' ITSCS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ COURT REPORTER WANDA HARRISON;10489 COURT ATTENDANT C. BELLAMY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ALFONSO ORTEGA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ, CLAUDIA RODRIGUEZ, ESTATE OF DA NIEL E. RODR IGUEZ, ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ. ATTORNEY MARY CHILDS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SHAYNE ARY. ATTORNEY REEM BLAIK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS, INC.. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD REMOTE HEARING HELD PURSUANT TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL EMERGENCY RULE OF COURT 3(A)(3) COURT NOTES THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENTS FILED BY PARTIES. - IT IS FURTHER NOTED BY THE COURT THAT DEFENDANT SHAYNE ARY PLEADED GUILTY AS TO THE CRIMINAL CHARGES ON SEPTEMBER 15, 2020. - DEFENSE ATTORNEY REPRESENTS THAT THEY ARE WORKING TOWARDS DEPOSING SHAYNE ARY PRIOR TO THE SENTENCING HEARING. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. REASON: FOR DEPOSITION TO BE TAKEN. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/18/20 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,605.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF CLAUDIA RODRIGUEZ, ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ, ESTATE OF DA NIEL E. RODR IGUEZ, ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ, CLAUDIA RODRIGUEZ, ESTATE OF DA NIEL E. RODR IGUEZ, ERNESTO RODRIGUEZ FOR 1ST APPEARANCE 190530-0546-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190530-0546-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2748

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less