This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:24:30 (UTC).

MF ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS -N- STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MF ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS -N- STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0927

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS

ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS

Others

STEPHANIE OLIVAS

ERIC D OLIVAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorney

, HEBER MORAN, ESQ

792 West Arrow Hwy, Ste I

Upland, CA 91786

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. HEBER MORAN, ESQ WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • PARTY ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS UPDATED: ADDRESS PER NTC OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • PARTY STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS UPDATED: ADDRESS THROUGH NTC OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. BEATRIZ A PELAYO-GARCIA WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/03/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF ERIC OLIVAS FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF ERIC OLIVAS ORDERED ENTERED 01/03/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF OLIVAS TO ENTER CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS RE: OTHER: TERMINATION OF STATUS & CONSOLIDATION OF CA (9/27/17); Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; KHYMBERLI S APALOO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM HARMON; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; BAILIFF: J SWAVELY; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS PRESENT; ATTORNEY CINDY MORAN-AGUIRRE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; 09:15; WITNESS -- PETITIONER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: TERMINATION OF STAUS/CONSOLIDATION OF CASES IS GRANTED; CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) FAMSS1402837 FOR ALL PURPOSES MASTER FILE FAMSS1700927.; **STATUS TAKEN**; COUNSEL INQUIRES OF PETITIONER; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS ON 03/06/17; BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS.; DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT; NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE.; COUNSEL FOR ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS TO PREPARE ORDER OR JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATION/THIS CASE DEEMED THE MASTER FILE-OTHER CASES CONSOLIDATED ARE: FAMSS 1402837

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2014
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/25/14 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON LEGAL SEPARATION WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/11/2014 OF STEPHANIE OLIVAS AS TO ERIC DANIEL OLIVAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE MARIE OLIVAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF ERIC OLIVAS.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.