This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:06:42 (UTC).

ERE VS RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 ERE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4692

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ERE INVESTMENTS LLC

CARLOS MORA

Defendants

JUAN M RAMIREZ

MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ

CARLOS MORA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH HEARING SENT.; Minutes; THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 8/09/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED, THE HEARING IS RESET FOR 7/28/17; AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT F7 ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH HEARING SENT.; Minutes; THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 8/09/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED, THE HEARING IS RESET FOR 7/28/17; AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT F7 ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO APPEAR

ANSWER FILED BY CARLOS MORA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CARLOS MORA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ERE INVESTMENTS LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ERE INVESTMENTS LLC.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUAN M RAMIREZ SERVED ON 07/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUAN M RAMIREZ SERVED ON 07/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 08/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 08/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/12/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/12/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/12/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/12/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ERE INVESTMENTS LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ERE INVESTMENTS LLC.

MOTION RE: MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA; Disposition: DENIED

MOTION RE: MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ANGEL COLEMAN FOR EDWARD PALMER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CARLOS MORA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:06; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED DEFENDANT CARLOS MORAS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO; QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS.; CARLOS MORA'S MOTION TO QUASH IS DENIED.; COURT FINDS MOTION TO BE FRIVOLOUS.; DEFENDANT HAS 5 DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170908-0285 $25.00; 170908-0285-CK Reference Number 81078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERE INVESTMENTS LLC; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ERE INVESTMENTS LLC PRESENT; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:56; DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE TO CONSULT WITH LEGAL AID/COUNSEL IS DENIED. DEFENDANT HAS; MORE THAN SUFFICIENT TIME TO CONSULT WITH LEGAL AID OR ATTORNEY.; PLAINTIFFS CASE IN CHIEF; ERAN FATTAL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; EVIDENCE (1. GRANT DEED) PRESENTED TO COURT ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF, MARKED FOR REFERENCE.; EVIDENCE (2. 3 DAY NOTICE) PRESENTED TO COURT ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF, MARKED FOR REFERENCE.; EVIDENCE (3. ADDENDUM NOTICE DATED 06/29/17/90 DAY NOTICE) PRESENTED TO COURT ON BEHALF OF THE; PLAINTIFF, MARKED FOR REFERENCE.; EVIDENCE (4. DECLARATION OF SERVICE FOR THE 90 DAY NOTICE & ADDENDUM) PRESENTED TO COURT ON; BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF, MARKED FOR REFERENCE.; DEFENDANTS CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- CARLOS MORA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; CLOSING ARGUMENTS PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERE INVESTMENTS LLC ORDERED ENTERED 09/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ERE INVESTMENTS LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ, CARLOS MORA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ, CARLOS MORA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $390.00 AND DAMAGES $2,520.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,910.00; PER PLAINTIFF, NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 09/30/17; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 10:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CALLED CARLOS MORA AND LEFT MESSAGE RE NEW HEARING DATE SET FOR 9/8/17 8:00AM IN DEPT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CARLOS MORA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:44; IT HAS BEEN BROUGHT TO THE COURTS ATTENTION THAT DEFENDANT CALLED AND STATED THAT HE WAS IN AN; AUTO ACCIDENT AND WOULD NOT BE PRESENT FOR TODAYS HEARING.; COUNSEL OBJECTS TO ANY CONTINUANCE.; CARLOS MORA'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERE INVESTMENTS LLC IS SET FOR 09/08/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7A; CLERKS OFFICE TO GIVE NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF NEXT HEARING VIA PHONE.; 08:46; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • REQ TO SET/POS/DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JUAN M RAMIREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JUAN M RAMIREZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER FILED BY JUAN M RAMIREZ, MARIA LUISA RAMIREZ; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 08/09/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT CARLOS MORA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $50.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0333 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less