This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:25:16 (UTC).

EQUITY VS SINGH

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 EQUITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SINGH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3518

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

VARINDER SINGH

MANDEEP SINGH

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANDEEP SINGH, VARINDER SINGH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MANDEEP SINGH, VARINDER SINGH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MANDEEP SINGH, VARINDER SINGH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MANDEEP SINGH, VARINDER SINGH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON VARINDER SINGH; POSTED ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON VARINDER SINGH; POSTED ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MANDEEP SINGH; POSTED ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MANDEEP SINGH; POSTED ON 05/31/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0900 $255.00; 170522-0900-CK Reference Number 533953

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANDEEP SINGH, VARINDER SINGH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,576.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $610.00 AND DAMAGES $2,521.44.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,207.44; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • WRIT RETURN RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170623-0352 $25.00; 170623-0352-CK Reference Number 534936

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0983 $20.00; 170526-0983-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,576.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $52.53.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0900 $255.00; 170522-0900-CK Reference Number 533953

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.