This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:33:14 (UTC).

EQUITY-V-ABBOTT

Case Summary

On 07/21/2011 EQUITY-V-ABBOTT was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0400

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

BRENT R ABBOTT

MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr Ste 900C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/21/2011 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENT R ABBOTT, MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,261.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $350.00 COSTS $415.00 AND DAMAGES $588.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,615.75; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( IN RUNNER BIN FOR P/UP); Minutes; Receipt: 110808-0571 $25.00; 110808-0571-CK Reference Number 442070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/21/2011 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/08/11; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENT R ABBOTT, MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRENT R ABBOTT, MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/21/2011 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC AS TO BRENT R ABBOTT, MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/23/11 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRENT R ABBOTT, MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA ELIZABETH ABBOTT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/23/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/21/2011 OF EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRENT R ABBOTT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/23/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110721-1868 $255.00; 110721-1868-CK Reference Number 441191

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.