Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 01:42:41 (UTC).

EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS -V- NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICHOLAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1370

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC

Defendant

RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE FIND ENCLOSED CHECK # 1186810 FOR $60.00 THE WRIT FEE IS $25.00. PLEASE RESEND A NEW CHECK; FOR $25.00 TO MY ATTENTION: ALEXANDRA ADAMS; NOTICES PRINTED

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 2818.00 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 2818.00 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0086 $25.00; 180405-0086-CK Reference Number 1186810

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $136.12), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $136.12), AND

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,198.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $558.88.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,656.88; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $230.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $230.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0089 $25.00; 170711-0089-CK Reference Number 1173384

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/07/17; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS; PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS; PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170620-0189 $255.00; 170620-0189-CK Reference Number 1174445

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180412-0505 $25.00; 180412-0505-CK Reference Number 1189117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE FIND ENCLOSED CHECK # 1186810 FOR $60.00 THE WRIT FEE IS $25.00. PLEASE RESEND A NEW CHECK; FOR $25.00 TO MY ATTENTION: ALEXANDRA ADAMS; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 2818.00 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0086 $25.00; 180405-0086-CK Reference Number 1186810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $136.12), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,198.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $558.88.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,656.88; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC AS TO RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RONALD DAMON NICHOLAS; PARTY SERVED ON 06/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/20/2017 OF EQUITY PREMIUM INVESTORS INC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,198.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $19.96.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170620-0189 $255.00; 170620-0189-CK Reference Number 1174445

    Read MoreRead Less