This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 08:52:49 (UTC).

EPC AMERICA,INC -V- KWANGWON USA,INC,ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2010 EPC AMERICA,INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KWANGWON USA,INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9301

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Cross Defendant

EPC AMERICA, INC

Appellants and Cross Defendants

HWA YOUN SEOL

WOORICHEMTECH CO LTD

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

JUN HEE KIM

KWANGWON USA INC

Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HEUNG YOUNG SOHN

EPC AMERICA INC.

JUN HEE KIM

PAROMA TDS CO., LTD

JEONGSOO LEE

SUNG PAN HUH

KWANGWON USA, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

KWANGWON USA INC

JAE SUL LEE

EPC AMERICA, INC

GUN CHOON LEE

ANDERSON,CALL & WILINSON PC

EPC KOREA INC

BASIC RESEARCH LLC

Appellants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WOORICHEMTECH CO LTD

KWANGWON USA, INC.

KWANGWON USA INC

Appellants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HWA YOUN SEOL

HEUNG YOUNG SOHN

EPC AMERICA INC.

JUN HEE KIM

WOORICHEMTECH CO LTD

PAROMA TDS CO., LTD

GUN YOUNG LEE

JEONGSOO LEE

SUNG PAN HUH

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

KWANGWON USA INC

JAE SUL LEE

EPC AMERICA, INC

GUN CHOON LEE

AMERICA INC

ANDERSON,CALL & WILINSON PC

EPC KOREA INC

BASIC RESEARCH LLC

WOORI CHEMTECH, INC.

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

KARACTER LAW FIRM

3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1510

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Appellant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM SHAPIRO PARK &LEE

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LOGOS PROFESSIONALLAW CORPORATION

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LEE COUNSEL, APLC

3600 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1510

Los Angeles, CA 90010

KARACTER LAW FIRM

3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1510

Los Angeles, CA 90010

GARFF, STEVEN W

5742 West Harold Gatty Drive

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 West Harold Gatty Drive

Salt Lake, UT 84116

Cross Defendant, Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOGOS PROFESSIONALLAW CORPORATION

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Cross Defendant, Respondent, Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE COUNSEL, APLC

3600 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1510

Los Angeles, CA 90010

KARACTER LAW FIRM

3600 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1510

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LOGOS PROFESSIONALLAW CORPORATION

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90010

PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 West Harold Gatty Drive

Salt Lake, UT 84116

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE AT OSC RE DISMISSAL.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/27/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY YU YANG PRESENT FOR WOORICHEMTECH CO. AND HWA YOUN SEOL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY YU YANG.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/23/2010 OF EPC AMERICA, INC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT/VACATING TRIAL DATES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINE PARK MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL CONTACTS THE COURT TELEPHONICALLY ADVISING THE COURT OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF; SETTLEMENT FILED JANUARY 17, 2018.; COURT VACATES TRIAL DATES AND SETS OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR MARCH 22, 2018 AT 8:30 A.M.; HEARINGS:; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; VACATE CTN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/29/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 03/22/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY CHRISTINE PARK.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY KWANGWON USA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KWANGWON USA INC FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180123-0346 $4.00; 180123-0346-VS Reference Number 033-0050782389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • ORDER CONTINUE TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
565 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/12/21 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YEUNG JOON KIM SERVED ON 08/27/10 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KWANGWON USA INC SERVED ON 08/27/10 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUN HEE KIM SERVED ON 08/27/10 WITH FEES OF $109.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2010
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 100825-0537 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/23/2010 OF EPC AMERICA, INC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100823-3253 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less