This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 16:06:08 (UTC).

Encarnacion et al -v- Providence Health et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Encarnacion filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Providence Health. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8861

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Encarnacion, Annaliza

Encarnacion, Jose

Defendants

CEP America-California

St. Mary Medical Center

Ebrahim, Ali, M.D

Samadani, Mohammadreza, M.D

Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of California, Inc

California Emergency Physicians Medical Group, APC

Providence Health

Desousa, Kavit, M.D

Damiani, Stephan, M.D

Podgorski, Teressa, M.D

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bostwick & Peterson, LLP

Attorney at Bostwick & Peterson, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

KJAR, McKenna & Stockalper, LLP

Attorney at KJAR, McKenna & Stockalper, LLP

Carroll, Kelly, Trotter & Franzen

Attorney at Carroll, Kelly, Trotter & Franzen

Kjar McKenna & Stockalper LLP

Attorney at Kjar McKenna & Stockalper LLP

R.J. RYAN LAW, APC

Attorney at R.J. RYAN LAW, APC

 

Court Documents

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/04/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

06/07/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

06/07/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

12/21/2020: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

12/21/2020: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

12/21/2020: Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

12/21/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialEncarnacion, Annaliza; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-34224; Encarnacion, Annaliza; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialEncarnacion, Annaliza; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $150.00 check paid on 06/09/2021 for advance jury fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialEbrahim, Ali, M.D.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-32703; Ebrahim, Ali, M.D.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialEbrahim, Ali, M.D.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialSamadani, Mohammadreza, M.D.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialEbrahim, Ali, M.D.; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialSt. Mary Medical Center; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialEncarnacion, Annaliza; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 check paid for first appearance fee by Encarncacion on 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of California, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant