This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 09:40:56 (UTC).

ELVIRA TORRES -V- LEONEL TORRES

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 ELVIRA TORRES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEONEL TORRES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1480

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELVIRA TORRES

Respondent

LEONEL TORRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/16/2017 OF ELVIRA TORRES FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/16/2017 OF ELVIRA TORRES ORDERED ENTERED 06/15/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 06/08/18 BY ELVIRA TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ELVIRA TORRES FOR WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LEONEL TORRES FOR PRELIM/WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LEONEL TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/16/2017 OF ELVIRA TORRES BY LEONEL TORRES FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170614-0943 $435.00; 170614-0943-CK Reference Number 6904

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEONEL TORRES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ELVIRA TORRES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ELVIRA TORRES FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ELVIRA TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.