This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:00:51 (UTC).

ELIZABETH RIVERA-V-STACY GRIFFIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 ELIZABETH RIVERA-V-STACY GRIFFIN was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7752

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH RIVERA

Defendants

LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT

STACY GRIFFIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L SCHIBEL APC

11100 Santa Monica Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT SCHIBEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELIZABETH RIVERA.; DEFENDANT STACY GRIFFIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; DEFENDANT STACY GRIFFIN IS ADVISED OF HER DEFAULT STATUS.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $75.00 PAYABLE TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/12/18.; SANCTIONS ARE IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(E)(G)(H).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT/ SANCTIONS SET FOR 05/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:59; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST STACY GRIFFIN, LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST STACY GRIFFIN, LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $65.42.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $65.42.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY GRIFFIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $37.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY GRIFFIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $37.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT LOCAL FORM NUMBER 13-16503-360; SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT/ SANCTIONS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • SANCTION FEE PAID.; Minutes; Receipt: 180329-0910 $75.00; 180329-0910-CK Reference Number CK 5561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT SCHIBEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELIZABETH RIVERA.; DEFENDANT STACY GRIFFIN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; DEFENDANT STACY GRIFFIN IS ADVISED OF HER DEFAULT STATUS.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $75.00 PAYABLE TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/12/18.; SANCTIONS ARE IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(E)(G)(H).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT/ SANCTIONS SET FOR 05/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:59; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST STACY GRIFFIN, LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF ELIZABETH RIVERA AS TO STACY GRIFFIN, LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEF. LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT HAS UNTIL 11/27/17 TO ANSWER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $65.42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY GRIFFIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $37.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT LOCAL FORM NUMBER 13-16503-360; SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELIZABETH RIVERA FOR NEW FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0279 $240.00; 170914-0279-CK Reference Number 182713

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH RIVERA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less