This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:12:36 (UTC).

ELECTRONICS -V- HAWK TRANSP

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ELECTRONICS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAWK TRANSP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9437

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC

Defendant

HAWK TRANSPORTATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Avenue Ste. 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,169.84 INTEREST $1,666.64 ATTORNEY FEES $1,166.98 COSTS $462.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13,465.46; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 11/27/17 AS TO HAWK TRANSPORTATION INC., FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 11/27/17 AS TO HAWK TRANSPORTATION INC., FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION OF DAVID SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT(CCP585) FILED

DECLARATION OF DAVID SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT(CCP585) FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 01/08/18 AS TO HAWK TRANSPORTATION, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,169.84 INTEREST $1,666.64 ATTORNEY FEES $1,166.98 COSTS $462.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13,465.46; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 11/27/17 AS TO HAWK TRANSPORTATION INC., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT(CCP585) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC AS TO HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HAWK TRANSPORTATIONINC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0336 $380.00; 171004-0336-CK Reference Number CK 62927

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less