This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:00:56 (UTC).

ELECTRONIC FUNDS-V-U&R TRANSP ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 ELECTRONIC FUNDS-V-U R TRANSP was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8845

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC

Defendants

KATHERINE LE

U&R TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY A. BEMIS

3870 La Sierra Ave. Suite 239

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,691.98

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,691.98

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HAS BEEN RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING; REASON(S): U&R TRANSPORATION, INC. DISMISSED FROM; CASE ON 03/27/18. JUDGMENT ONLY ENTERED AGAINST KATHERINE LE. PLEASE REVISE AND; RESUBMIT.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $161.21)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $161.21)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/26/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/26/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/26/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC ORDERED ENTERED 05/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHERINE LE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,845.89 INTEREST $1,050.30 ATTORNEY FEES $1,134.58 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,530.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION OF GARY A BEMIS IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INT FILED

DECLARATION OF GARY A BEMIS IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INT FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHERINE LE FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHERINE LE FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO U&R TRANSPORTATION,INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO U&R TRANSPORTATION,INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A SUMMONS & COMPLAINT AS TO KATHERINE LE. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 03/19/18.

FILED PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF A SUMMONS & COMPLAINT AS TO KATHERINE LE. PUBLICATION COMPLETED ON 03/19/18.

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER RIVERSIDE BUSINESS JOURNAL FOR KATHERINE LE FILED

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER RIVERSIDE BUSINESS JOURNAL FOR KATHERINE LE FILED

DECLARATION OF GARY A. BEMIS IN SUPPORT OF AOP OF SUMMONS FILED

DECLARATION OF GARY A. BEMIS IN SUPPORT OF AOP OF SUMMONS FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KATHERINE LE WITH COSTS OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KATHERINE LE WITH COSTS OF $50.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,691.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION BY MAIL ON 12/20/18 AS TO KATHERINE LE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HAS BEEN RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING; REASON(S): U&R TRANSPORATION, INC. DISMISSED FROM; CASE ON 03/27/18. JUDGMENT ONLY ENTERED AGAINST KATHERINE LE. PLEASE REVISE AND; RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180720-0592 $25.00; 180720-0592-CK Reference Number 16382

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( 12716.98 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180717-0714 $25.00; 180717-0714-CK Reference Number 16383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $161.21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF POS OF U&R TRANSP/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GARY A. BEMIS IN SUPPORT OF AOP OF SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMONS FILED BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KATHERINE LE WITH COSTS OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170926-0745 $240.00; 170926-0745-CK Reference Number #105645

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.